NH HB328 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-05 - Public Hearing: 03/05/2021 10:30 a.m.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the application process for drivers' licenses and relative to privacy of motor vehicle records.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the application process for drivers' licenses and relative to privacy of motor vehicle records.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-05HousePublic Hearing: 03/05/2021 10:30 a.m.
2021-01-09HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Transportation House Journal 2 P. 43

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback