NH HB327 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote House Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote House Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the state from requiring the public use proprietary software when visiting state websites.
Title
Prohibiting the state from requiring the public use proprietary software when visiting state websites.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-02 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote House Journal 4 |
2023-01-25 | House | Executive Session: 01/18/2023 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-01-24 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB327-FN 01/18/2023 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 3 |
2023-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2023 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 3 P. 11 |