NH HB324 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 31 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-16 - Subcommittee Work Session: 01/22/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 305
Pending: House Resources, Recreation and Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to operation of ski craft around the marsh lands or flats in the Hampton/Seabrook estuary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to operation of ski craft around the marsh lands or flats in the Hampton/Seabrook estuary.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-16HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 01/22/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 305
2019-01-08HousePublic Hearing: 01/15/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 305
2018-12-31HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback