NH HB324 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Enrolled 05/08/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to operation of personal water craft around the marsh lands or flats in the Hampton/Seabrook estuary.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to operation of personal water craft around the marsh lands or flats in the Hampton/Seabrook estuary.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseEnrolled 05/08/2019
2019-05-16SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/15/2019); Senate Journal 17
2019-05-02SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15
2019-04-24SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2019; Senate Calendar 20
2019-04-10SenateHearing: 04/23/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 18
2019-03-29SenateIntroduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 12
2019-03-19HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0454h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 31
2019-03-19HouseAmendment # 2019-0454h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 31
2019-03-11HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0454h (NT) for 03/19/2019 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 12
2019-02-15HouseExecutive Session: 03/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2019-02-05HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/12/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2019-01-30HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/05/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2019-01-23HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 01/29/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2019-01-16HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 01/22/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 305
2019-01-08HousePublic Hearing: 01/15/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 305
2018-12-31HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 2 P. 45

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback