NH HB323 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to signage advertising liquor or beverages.
Title
Relative to signage advertising liquor or beverages.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 5 |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/19/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 4 |
2019-02-28 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/08/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2019-02-27 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/05/2019 08:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-29 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/06/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/06/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-12-31 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 2 P. 45 |