NH HB322 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 227-150 02/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to reporting the taking of a turkey.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to reporting the taking of a turkey.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - House - ITL (Y: 227 N: 150 NV: 6 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 227-150 02/14/2019
2019-01-30HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2019-01-30HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/14/2019 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 15
2019-01-16HouseExecutive Session: 01/29/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 307
2019-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/22/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2018-12-31HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources House Journal 2 P. 45

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback