NH HB319 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB319
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Vetoed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Vetoed by Governor Sununu 02/23/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-08 - Vetoed by Governor Sununu 02/23/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring students in the university and community college systems of New Hampshire to pass the United States Citizenship and Immigration Services civics naturalization test.
Title
Requiring students in the university and community college systems of New Hampshire to pass the United States Citizenship and Immigration Services civics naturalization test.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Moffett [R] | Sen. Howard Pearl [R] | Sen. Timothy Lang [R] | Rep. Claire Rouillard [R] |
Rep. Barbara Shaw [D] | Rep. Deborah Hobson [R] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | Vetoed by Governor Sununu 02/23/2022 |
2022-02-15 | House | Enrolled 02/15/22 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 02/03/2022); Senate Journal 3 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Sen. Giuda Moved Ought to Pass; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Motion Failed; 02/03/2022; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/03/2022; Senate Calendar 5 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Sen. Giuda Moved to Remove HB 319 from the Consent Calendar; 01/05/2022; Senate Journal 1 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Special Order to the Next Session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 01/05/2022; Senate Journal 1 |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 01/05/2022; Senate Calendar 49 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15 |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/13/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 23 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 04/27/2021, 09:30 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 21 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Introduced 04/08/2021 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 12 |
2021-04-08 | House | Reconsider (Rep. McGuire): Motion Failed DV 186-189 04/08/2021 House Journal 6 P. 32 |
2021-04-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0726h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 188-187 04/08/2021 House Journal 6 P. 26 |
2021-04-08 | House | Amendment # 2021-0726h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/08/2021 House Journal 6 P. 26 |
2021-03-24 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2021-03-24 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0726h (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 39 |
2021-03-11 | House | Executive Session: 03/11/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95090800832 |
2021-03-02 | House | Public Hearing: 03/02/2021 10:45 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/97910276071 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 43 |
Same As/Similar To
HB319 (Carry Over) 2021-10-26 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar