NH HB308 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed By Governor 07/10/2013; Effective 09/08/2013; Chapter 0209
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed By Governor 07/10/2013; Effective 09/08/2013; Chapter 0209
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to technical changes to election laws.
Title
Relative to technical changes to election laws.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | House | Signed By Governor 07/10/2013; Effective 09/08/2013; Chapter 0209 |
2013-06-14 | House | Enrolled, Recess of 6/5/13; House Journal 49, PG.1654 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-05 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1223s (Rep Cote): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 49, PG.1586 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1223s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1223s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1223s, 4/18/13; Senate Calendar 16 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Hearing: 4/3/13, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 14 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public & Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 7 |
2013-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG.654 |
2013-02-19 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 6 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 20, PG.409 |
2013-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 2/14/2013 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2013-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 1/29/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Election Law; House Journal 12, PG.191 |