NH HB305 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB305
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 18; Eff. 7/14/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 18; Eff. 7/14/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifying lessee liability for month-to-month leases.
Title
Clarifying lessee liability for month-to-month leases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/15/2018; Chapter 18; Eff. 7/14/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Enrolled 04/19/2018 House Journal 13 P. 2 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/12/2018); Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-05 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2551s (Rep. Hagan): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/05/2018 House Journal 11 P. 2 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2017-2551s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2017-2551s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/03/2018; Senate Journal 1 |
2017-12-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-2551s, 01/03/2018; Senate Calendar 48 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/31/2017; Senate Journal 18 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Sen. Innis Moved to Rerefer to Committee, 05/31/2017; Senate Journal 18 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Sen. Innis Moved to Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/31/2017; Senate Journal 18 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Pending Motion Committee Amendment # 2017-1990s; 05/31/2017; Senate Journal 18 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Sen. Innis Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/31/2017; Senate Journal 18 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-1990s, 05/31/2017; Senate Calendar 25 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Hearing: 05/09/2017, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm, on proposed amendment # 2017-1550s; Senate Calendar 21 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Hearing: 04/04/2017, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 17 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/09/2017 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 9 |
2017-03-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 36 |
2017-02-16 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/08/2017 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 16 |
2017-02-01 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-01-06 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 3 P. 8 |
Same As/Similar To
HB305 (Carry Over) 2017-06-01 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/31/2017; Senate Journal 18