NH HB304 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Signed by the Governor on 6/2/2015; Chapter 66; Effective Date 6/2/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Signed by the Governor on 6/2/2015; Chapter 66; Effective Date 6/2/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study public access to political campaign information.
Title
Establishing a committee to study public access to political campaign information.
Sponsors
Rep. Kathleen Hoelzel [R] | Rep. James Belanger [R] | Sen. David Pierce [D] | Rep. David Cote [D] |
Sen. James Gray [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. Marcia Moody [D] | Rep. Richard Marston [R] |
Sen. Dan Feltes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | House | Signed by the Governor on 6/2/2015; Chapter 66; Effective Date 6/2/2015 |
2015-05-19 | House | Enrolled (in recess of 5/6/2015); House Journal 41, PG. 1781 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 5/14/2015); Senate Journal 15 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 13 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 5/7/15; Senate Calendar 20 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Hearing: 3/25/15, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 14 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-04 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0359h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 560 |
2015-03-04 | House | Amendment #0359h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 560 |
2015-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0359h for Mar 4 (Vote 15-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar18, PG. 345 |
2015-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 2/17/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2015-01-30 | House | ==CANCELED== Executive Session: 2/4/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2015-01-26 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/28/2015 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2015-01-21 | House | ==POSTPONED== Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Election Law; House Journal 12, PG. 216 |