NH HB302 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to including education in the United States Constitution, the Bill of Rights, and the New Hampshire constitution for New Hampshire law enforcement.
Title
Relative to including education in the United States Constitution, the Bill of Rights, and the New Hampshire constitution for New Hampshire law enforcement.
Sponsors
Rep. David Love [R] | Rep. Dan Hynes [R] | Sen. Keith Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-14 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 |
2023-02-08 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB302-FN-A 02/03/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 3 |
2023-01-24 | House | Executive Session: 02/03/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/20/2023 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 10 |