NH HB298 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/20/2021; Senate Calendar 24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Adding a member to the aviation users advisory board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adding a member to the aviation users advisory board.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-12SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/20/2021; Senate Calendar 24
2021-03-25SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/25/2021; Senate Journal 9
2021-03-17SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/25/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16
2021-03-11SenateRemote Hearing: 03/16/2021, 01:15 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 15
2021-03-04SenateIntroduced 03/04/2021 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 7
2021-02-24HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0206h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 8
2021-02-24HouseAmendment # 2021-0206h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 8
2021-02-16HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0206h (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 6
2021-01-28HousePublic Hearing: 02/08/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/99308877767 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-09HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 42

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback