NH HB298 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB298
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-14 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2399h (NT) for 01/03/2018 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-14 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2399h (NT) for 01/03/2018 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the mechanical licensing board.
Title
Relative to the mechanical licensing board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2399h (NT) for 01/03/2018 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) |
2017-10-03 | House | Executive Session: 11/01/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-08-16 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 08/22/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-03-02 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-02-08 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 02/21/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-02-01 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/15/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-01-06 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 3 P. 7 |
Same As/Similar To
HB298 (Carry Over) 2017-11-14 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2399h (NT) for 01/03/2018 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar)