NH HB297 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 206-157 02/02/2017 House Journal 5 P. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-02 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 206-157 02/02/2017 House Journal 5 P. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing the education tax credit program.
Title
Repealing the education tax credit program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-02 - House - ITL (Y: 206 N: 157 NV: 11 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-02 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 206-157 02/02/2017 House Journal 5 P. 15 |
2017-01-25 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2017-01-25 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/02/2017 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 8 |
2017-01-11 | House | Executive Session: 01/19/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2017 03:15 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2017-01-06 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Education House Journal 3 P. 7 |