NH HB297 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-08 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2360h (NT)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-08 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2360h (NT)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Protecting individual customer data from disclosure by a public utility.
Title
Protecting individual customer data from disclosure by a public utility.
Sponsors
Rep. Neal Kurk [R] | Rep. David Borden [D] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-08 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2360h (NT) |
2015-07-08 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 26 |
2015-06-24 | House | Executive Session: 6/30/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2015-06-16 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 6/23/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2015-02-12 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-12 | House | Executive Session: 2/12/2015 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2015-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 2/10/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; House Journal 12, PG. 216 |