NH HB297 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-22 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2381h for Jan 8 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-22 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2381h for Jan 8 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the management of trust funds and capital reserve funds.
Title
Relative to the management of trust funds and capital reserve funds.
Sponsors
Rep. Frederick Rice [R] | Rep. Joseph Hagan [R] | Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] | Rep. Kris Roberts [D] |
Rep. Tracy Emerick [R] | Sen. David Boutin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-22 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2381h for Jan 8 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) |
2013-10-16 | House | Retained Bill-Executive Session: 11/12/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-10-16 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 11/12/2013 9:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303 |
2013-10-10 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/24/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-09-19 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/10/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-03-20 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | Executive Session: 3/20/2013 12:45 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-03-20 | House | Recommit (Rep Porter): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 27, PG.845 |
2013-02-26 | House | Proposed Minority Committee Amendment #2013-0292h; House Calendar 23 PG.610-612 |
2013-02-26 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0292h; House Calendar 23 PG.581 |
2013-02-26 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 20 (Vote 14-1; Part I, Regular Calendar); House Calendar 23 PG.581 |
2013-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 2/21/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 2/5/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 12, PG.190 |