NH HB295 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1966s, 05/23/2019; Senate Calendar 23
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a special marriage officiant license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a special marriage officiant license.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - House - OTP (Y: 214 N: 155 NV: 11 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 154 N: 215 NV: 11 Abs: 20) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1966s, 05/23/2019; Senate Calendar 23
2019-04-18SenateHearing: 04/23/2019, Room 100, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 19
2019-04-12SenateIntroduced 04/11/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 13
2019-04-04HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 214-155 04/04/2019
2019-04-04HouseAmendment # 2019-1205h: Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 154-215 04/04/2019
2019-03-28HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1205h
2019-03-28HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/04/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 6
2019-03-19HouseExecutive Session: 03/27/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-03-19HouseFull Committee Work Session: 03/26/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-03-13HouseFull Committee Work Session: 03/18/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202
2019-02-27HousePublic Hearing: 03/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-02-14HouseReferred to Ways and Means 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 60
2019-02-14HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 206-138 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 60
2019-01-24HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-01-24HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/14/2019 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 16
2019-01-09HouseExecutive Session: 01/22/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 208
2019-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/16/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building208
2018-12-31HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 44

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback