NH HB295 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Introduced on December 31 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Executive Session: 01/22/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 208
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Hearing: Jan 22 @ 1:00 pm in Legislative Office Building 208
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a special marriage officiant license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a special marriage officiant license.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-09HouseExecutive Session: 01/22/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 208
2019-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/16/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building208
2018-12-31HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Judiciary

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback