NH HB295 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-09 - House Law Without Signature 06/09/2011; Effective 06/09/2011; Chapter 0157; NH Constitution, Art.44, Pt.II
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the use of long-term antibiotics for the treatment of Lyme disease.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the use of long-term antibiotics for the treatment of Lyme disease.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-09 House Law Without Signature 06/09/2011; Effective 06/09/2011; Chapter 0157; NH Constitution, Art.44, Pt.II
2011-06-01 House Enrolled; House Journal 48, PG.1669
2011-06-01 Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 20, Pg.546
2011-05-18 House House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1539s (Rep Reagan): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG.1531
2011-05-04 Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 15, Pg.312
2011-05-04 Senate Ought to Pass with Amendments 1539s, 1743s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 15, Pg.307
2011-05-04 Senate Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment #2011-1743s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15, Pg.306
2011-05-04 Senate Committee Amendment 1539s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15, Pg.306
2011-04-25 Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-1539s, 5/4/11; Senate Calendar 22
2011-03-31 Senate Hearing: 4/14/11, Room 100, State House, 2:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 18
2011-03-30 Senate Introduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 12, Pg.243
2011-03-16 House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0748h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 28, PG.858
2011-03-16 House Amendment #0748h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 28, PG.858
2011-03-09 House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-0748h; House Calendar 23, PG.599
2011-03-09 House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0748h for Mar 15 (Vote 18-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.555
2011-03-01 House Executive Session: 3/9/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205
2011-03-01 House Subcommittee Work Session: 3/3/2011 9:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205
2011-02-15 House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/16/2011 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205
2011-02-09 House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/15/2011 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205
2011-01-25 House Public Hearing: 2/3/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205-207
2011-01-20 House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 11, PG. 181

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback