NH HB292 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Introduced 04/08/2021 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 12
Pending: Senate Election Law and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the absentee ballot application process.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the absentee ballot application process.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - House - OTP (Y: 198 N: 174 NV: 26 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13SenateIntroduced 04/08/2021 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 12
2021-04-08HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 198-174 04/08/2021
2021-03-29HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2021-03-29HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 43
2021-03-08HouseExecutive Session: 03/08/2021 12:00 pm Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/91394352757
2021-03-04HousePublic Hearing: 03/04/2021 01:00 pm Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/91092569734Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-03-03House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 03/10/2021 10:20 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/95087806399 (if necessary)
2021-01-09HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Election Law House Journal 2 P. 42

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback