NH HB290 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - Special Order to Regular Calendar of next Session day Without Objection House Journal 4 P. 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - Special Order to Regular Calendar of next Session day Without Objection House Journal 4 P. 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to policies required for health facilities and special health care service licenses.
Title
Relative to policies required for health facilities and special health care service licenses.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark McLean [R] | Rep. Ross Berry [R] | Rep. Mark Warden [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | House | Special Order to Regular Calendar of next Session day Without Objection House Journal 4 P. 46 |
2021-02-05 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2021-02-05 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 30 |
2021-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2021 10:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94852322897 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time thecommittee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 2 P. 42 |