NH HB290 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 207-131 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 207-131 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 22
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the removal of certain wood stoves upon the sale of a home and notification of such removal to the department of environmental services.
Title
Relative to the removal of certain wood stoves upon the sale of a home and notification of such removal to the department of environmental services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - House - ITL (Y: 207 N: 131 NV: 18 Abs: 44) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 207-131 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 22 |
2019-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/27/2019 (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 25 |
2019-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 304 |
2018-12-28 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 2 P. 44 |