NH HB289 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to consultation with legal counsel under the right to know law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to consultation with legal counsel under the right to know law.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-14HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5
2023-02-08HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB289-FN 02/01/2023 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 9
2023-01-25HouseExecutive Session: 02/01/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208
2023-01-11HousePublic Hearing: 01/19/2023 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 206-208
2023-01-09HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 3 P. 10

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback