NH HB289 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Lay on Table (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 56
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Lay on Table (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 56
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the recitation of the Lord's prayer in public elementary schools.
Title
Relative to the recitation of the Lord's prayer in public elementary schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 56 |
2019-02-12 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2019-02-12 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/27/2019 (Vote 15-5; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 28 |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-12-28 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 44 |