NH HB288 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 73
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 73
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to notice of county convention meetings.
Title
Relative to notice of county convention meetings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 73 |
2019-01-29 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2019-01-29 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/14/2019 (Vote 18-1; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 18 |
2019-01-16 | House | Executive Session: 01/23/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2019-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/15/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 301 |
2018-12-28 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 2 P. 44 |