NH HB286 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB286
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-01 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-01 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring reporting on suicide deaths of individuals receiving services through the department of health and human services or its subcontractors.
Title
Requiring reporting on suicide deaths of individuals receiving services through the department of health and human services or its subcontractors.
Sponsors
Rep. James MacKay [D] | Rep. Mariellen MacKay [R] | Rep. Mariellen MacKay [R] | Rep. Joseph Guthrie [R] |
Rep. Donald LeBrun [R] | Rep. Linda Kenison [D] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. David Danielson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-01 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2017-10-11 | House | Executive Session: 10/26/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-09-05 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/20/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-08-15 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 08/30/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-02-24 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-15 | House | Executive Session: 02/22/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-01-17 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2017 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2016-12-30 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 2 P. 22 |
Same As/Similar To
HB286 (Carry Over) 2017-11-01 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)