NH HB283 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB283
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-26 - Executive Session: 11/08/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 House Calendar 39
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-26 - Executive Session: 11/08/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 House Calendar 39
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To limit application fees charged to prospective residential tenants.
Title
To limit application fees charged to prospective residential tenants.
Sponsors
Rep. Ellen Read [D] | Rep. Christine Seibert [D] | Rep. Carry Spier [D] | Rep. Sherry Dutzy [D] |
Rep. Kathy Staub [D] | Rep. Jodi Newell [D] | Rep. Daniel Veilleux [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-26 | House | Executive Session: 11/08/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 House Calendar 39 |
2023-09-22 | House | Executive Session: 11/15/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-09-22 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 11/08/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 House Calendar 39 |
2023-09-07 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/26/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 House Calendar 36 |
2023-05-17 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 06/07/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-02-15 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-01-30 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/09/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 3 P. 9 |
Same As/Similar To
HB283 (Carry Over) 2023-09-26 - Executive Session: 11/08/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 House Calendar 39