NH HB280 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to attendance at an auction of property or contraband from a criminal forfeiture.
Title
Relative to attendance at an auction of property or contraband from a criminal forfeiture.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 16 |
2017-02-16 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/08/2017 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 9 |
2017-02-01 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2017-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2016-12-30 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 2 P. 22 |