NH HB277 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to termination of a state of emergency by the legislature.
Title
Relative to termination of a state of emergency by the legislature.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50 |
2021-04-07 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 42 |
2021-03-31 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 19 |
2021-03-17 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Executive Session: 03/29/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/96696519759 |
2021-03-09 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/09/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/97592045901 |
2021-03-01 | House | Public Hearing: 03/01/2021 11:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95526791336 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 2 P. 41 |