NH HB274 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Retained in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the payment of the meals and rooms tax by individuals renting cars through an online service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the payment of the meals and rooms tax by individuals renting cars through an online service.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13HouseRetained in Committee
2019-02-27HouseExecutive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-02-14HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202
2019-01-30HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202
2019-01-17House==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 01/24/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202
2019-01-16House==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/22/2019 03:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202
2018-12-28HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 2 P. 43

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback