NH HB272 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 12
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designating the Ham Branch River watershed in Easton as a protected river, and exempting portions of the Ham Branch River watershed from the shoreland water quality protection act.
Title
Designating the Ham Branch River watershed in Easton as a protected river, and exempting portions of the Ham Branch River watershed from the shoreland water quality protection act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | === RESCHEDULED === Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 4/30/15; Senate Calendar 19 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | === CANCELLED SESSION === Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 4/23/15; Senate Calendar 18 |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Hearing: 4/15/15, Room 100, State House, 9:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 17 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0530h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG. 1256-1258 |
2015-03-12 | House | Amendment #0530h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG. 1256-1258 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0530h (NT) for Mar 11 (Vote 14-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 434 |
2015-02-18 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2015-02-18 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 3/3/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 |
2015-02-18 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 3/3/2015 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2015-02-04 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 3/3/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 |
2015-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/4/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 303 |
2015-01-26 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 1/28/2015 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 305 |
2015-01-21 | House | ==POSTPONED== Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 305 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 12, PG. 215 |