NH HB269 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed By Governor 07/09/2013; Effective 9/7/2013; Chapter 0197
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed By Governor 07/09/2013; Effective 9/7/2013; Chapter 0197
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing a school district to conduct a special meeting necessitated by changes in adequate education funding.
Title
Authorizing a school district to conduct a special meeting necessitated by changes in adequate education funding.
Sponsors
Rep. Ralph Boehm [R] | Rep. Lynne Ober [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | House | Signed By Governor 07/09/2013; Effective 9/7/2013; Chapter 0197 |
2013-06-14 | House | Enrolled, Recess of 6/5/13; House Journal 49, PG.1654 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-05 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1619s(NT) (Rep Gile): Motion Adopted Division Vote 200-124; House Journal 49, PG.1562 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1619s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1619s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1619s, New Title, 5/23/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 21 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Hearing: 5/1/13, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 18 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public & Municipal Affairs |
2013-03-27 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 31, PG.1024 |
2013-03-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 27 (Vote 22-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 25, PG.705 |
2013-03-20 | House | Executive Session: 3/19/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2013-03-08 | House | Division II Work Session: 3/14/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 209 |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to Finance; House Journal 24, PG.651-652 |
2013-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0359h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG.651-652 |
2013-03-06 | House | Amendment #0359h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG.651-652 |
2013-02-19 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-0359h; House Calendar 20, PG.446-447 |
2013-02-19 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0359h for Mar 6 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 20, PG.407 |
2013-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 2/19/2013 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-02-13 | House | Recommit (Rep Gile): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 17, PG.347 |
2013-02-13 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Kurk); House Journal 17, PG.329 |
2013-02-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 13 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 13, PG.209 |
2013-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 2/5/2013 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 1/29/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Education; House Journal 12, PG.189 |