NH HB265 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2023 House Journal 8 P. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2023 House Journal 8 P. 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to municipal property tax relief for installation of fire suppression systems.
Title
Relative to municipal property tax relief for installation of fire suppression systems.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2023 House Journal 8 P. 8 |
2023-02-27 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB265 02/15/2023 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 6 |
2023-02-13 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/16/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-02-08 | House | Executive Session: 02/15/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 301 |
2023-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2023 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 3 P. 9 |