NH HB264 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB264
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-04 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-09-04 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Making an appropriation to the Carroll, Strafford, and Coos counties freight rail improvements project and making an appropriation for the Coos county freight rail improvements project.
Title
Making an appropriation to the Carroll, Strafford, and Coos counties freight rail improvements project and making an appropriation for the Coos county freight rail improvements project.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-04 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) |
2019-08-21 | House | Executive Session: 09/04/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-02-06 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/22/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2018-12-28 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 2 P. 43 |
Same As/Similar To
HB264 (Carry Over) 2019-09-04 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar)