NH HB261 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Special Order to to the present time, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the commissioner of the department of environmental services to revise rules relative to arsenic contamination in drinking water.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring the commissioner of the department of environmental services to revise rules relative to arsenic contamination in drinking water.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateSpecial Order to to the present time, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-23SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 2019-1983s and 2019-2243s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-23SenateSen. Sherman Floor Amendment # 2019-2243s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-23SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1983s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-15SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1983s, 05/23/2019; Senate Calendar 23
2019-04-10SenateHearing: 04/16/2019, Room 103, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 18
2019-03-29SenateIntroduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 12
2019-03-19HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0028h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 30
2019-03-19HouseAmendment # 2019-0028h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 30
2019-03-11HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0028h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 17-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 11
2019-02-15HouseExecutive Session: 03/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2019-01-30HousePublic Hearing: 02/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2018-12-28HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 2 P. 43

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback