NH HB260 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 20Y-3N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 05/06/2021; Senate Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to number plates for motor vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to number plates for motor vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-06 - House - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - OTPA (Y: 210 N: 163 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 20Y-3N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 05/06/2021; Senate Journal 14
2021-04-27SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/06/2021; Senate Calendar 22
2021-04-15SenateRemote Hearing: 04/20/2021, 01:30 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 20
2021-04-13SenateIntroduced 04/08/2021 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 12
2021-04-09HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0208h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 210-163 04/09/2021
2021-04-09HouseAmendment # 2021-0208h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/09/2021
2021-02-19HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2021-02-19HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0208h (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 61
2021-01-27HouseExecutive Session: 02/05/2021 02:15 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92807074926
2021-01-21HousePublic Hearing: 01/29/2021 03:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/99305477189 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-09HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Transportation House Journal 2 P. 41

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback