NH HB257 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB257
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to purchasing alliances.
Title
Relative to purchasing alliances.
Sponsors
Rep. John Hunt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-13 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2019-09-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/01/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-09-11 | House | Executive Session: 10/23/2019 12:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-08-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/10/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-06-17 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 06/25/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-02-13 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 02/06/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/06/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2019-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 2 P. 43 |
Same As/Similar To
HB257 (Carry Over) 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar)