NH HB255 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/09/2017; Chapter 44; Eff. 7/8/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/09/2017; Chapter 44; Eff. 7/8/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to allowing a designee for the commissioner of the department of administrative services on certain commissions.
Title
Relative to allowing a designee for the commissioner of the department of administrative services on certain commissions.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynne Ober [R] | Rep. Tracy Emerick [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Rep. Carol McGuire [R] |
Rep. Carl Seidel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/09/2017; Chapter 44; Eff. 7/8/2017 |
2017-05-03 | House | Enrolled 04/20/2017 House Journal 14 P. 26 |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/27/2017); Senate Journal 16 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/20/2017; Senate Journal 14 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/20/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Hearing: 04/05/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 17 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Introduced 02/16/2017 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 7 |
2017-01-26 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/26/2017 House Journal 4 P. 4 |
2017-01-11 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 01/26/2017 (Vote 10-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 8 P. 3 |
2017-01-11 | House | Executive Session: 01/10/2017 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-01-04 | House | Public Hearing: 01/10/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2016-12-30 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 22 |