NH HB250 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/17/2021; Chapter 215; Eff: 08/17/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to pet vendors.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to pet vendors.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-08-17HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 08/17/2021; Chapter 215; Eff: 08/17/2021
2021-07-12HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021
2021-07-12SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20
2021-06-10HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 2021-1290s (Rep. Pearl): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 10
2021-05-13SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-1290s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15
2021-05-13SenateCommittee Amendment # 2021-1290s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15
2021-05-04SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1290s, 05/13/2021; Senate Calendar 23
2021-04-19SenateRemote Hearing: 04/19/2021, 01:20 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 20
2021-04-07SenateIntroduced 04/01/2021 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 11
2021-04-07HouseReconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50
2021-04-07HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0350h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 17
2021-04-07HouseAmendment # 2021-0350h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 17
2021-02-18HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0350h (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 10
2021-01-26HousePublic Hearing: 02/03/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95965527325 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout theday (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-09HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 2 P. 40

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback