NH HB25 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-13 - Signed by the Governor on 7/9/2015; Chapter 220; Sections 18-23 Effective 6/30/2015, Remaining Effective 7/1/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-13 - Signed by the Governor on 7/9/2015; Chapter 220; Sections 18-23 Effective 6/30/2015, Remaining Effective 7/1/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Making appropriations for capital improvements.
Title
Making appropriations for capital improvements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-28 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Sen. Lasky Floor Amendment 1966s (Y: 8 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Sen. Lasky Floor Amendment 1966s (Y: 8 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-13 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/9/2015; Chapter 220; Sections 18-23 Effective 6/30/2015, Remaining Effective 7/1/2015 |
2015-07-02 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 6/24/2015); House Journal 54, PG. 2141 |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-30 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015-2343eba: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (In recess of 6/24/2015); House Journal 54, PG. 2139 |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2343e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-24 | House | Conference Committee Report 2317c: Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 54, PG. 2121-2122 |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 2317c; Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Conference Committee Report #2015-2317c; Senate Amendment + New Amendment, Filed |
2015-06-18 | House | ==Continued==Conference Committee Meeting: 6/18/2015 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2015-06-17 | House | ==Continued==Conference Committee Meeting: 6/18/2015 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201==Recessed== |
2015-06-16 | House | ==Continued==Conference Committee Meeting: 6/17/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 201==Recessed== |
2015-06-16 | House | ==Continued==Conference Committee Meeting: 6/16/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 201==Recessed== |
2015-06-15 | House | ==Continued== Conference Committee Meeting: 6/16/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201==Recessed== |
2015-06-10 | House | ==Continued== Conference Committee Meeting: 6/15/2015 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 ==Recessed== |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Conferee Change; Senator D'Allesandro Replaces Senator Kelly |
2015-06-09 | House | ==Continued== Conference Committee Meeting: 6/10/2015 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 201 ==Recessed== |
2015-06-08 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 6/9/2015 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 ==Recessed== |
2015-06-04 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Daniels, Boutin, and Kelly |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Sen. Daniels Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 17 |
2015-06-03 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps Chandler, McConkey, Franklin Tilton, and Ebel; House Journal 44, PG. 1815 |
2015-06-03 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendments #1923s, and #1971s and Requests Committee of Conference (Rep Chandler): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1815 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1923s, and 1971s, Regular Calendar 22Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 16 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Sen. Lasky Floor Amendment #2015-1966s, Regular Calendar 8Y-14N, Amendment Failed; Senate Journal 16 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Sen. Feltes Floor Amendment #2015-1971s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 16 |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1923s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1923s, 5/28/15; Senate Calendar 23A |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Hearing: 4/15/15, Room 100, State House, 2:15 p.m.; Senate Calendar 17 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Introduced 3/26/2015 and Referred to Capital Budget; Senate Journal 11 |
2015-04-01 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1121h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 31, PG. 1344-1354 |
2015-04-01 | House | Amendment #1121h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 31, PG. 1344-1354 |
2015-03-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1121h for Apr 1 (Vote 18-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 25, PG. 904-905 |
2015-03-17 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 3/18/2015 12:15 PM Legislative Office Building 201 |
2015-03-11 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 3/17/2015 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 201 |
2015-03-11 | House | Continued Executive Session (if needed): 3/26/2015 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2015-03-11 | House | Continued Executive Session (if needed): 3/24/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2015-03-11 | House | Continued Executive Session: 3/19/2015 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2015-03-11 | House | Executive Session: 3/18/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2015-03-06 | House | Continued Public Hearing: 3/18/2015 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2015-03-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 3/11/2015 12:15 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-03-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 3/11/2015 12:05 PM Legislative Office Building 201 |
2015-03-05 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 3/13/2015 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2015-02-26 | House | Continued Public Hearing & Department Presentations 3/17/2015 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2015-02-26 | House | Continued Public Hearing & Department Presentations 3/6/2015 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2015-02-26 | House | Continued Public Hearing & Department Presentations 3/5/2015 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2015-02-26 | House | Public Hearing & Department Presentations 3/3/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2015-02-18 | House | Introduced and Referred to Public Works and Highways. |