NH HB248 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB248
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - Interim Study Work Session: 06/08/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-18 - Interim Study Work Session: 06/08/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208
Summary
Relative to the judicial retirement plan.
Title
Relative to the judicial retirement plan.
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Lynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-18 | House | Interim Study Work Session: 06/08/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-01-11 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/05/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study HB248 09/28/2021 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 13 |
2021-09-08 | House | Executive Session: 09/28/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2021-02-18 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 01/26/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94597513398 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 40 |
Same As/Similar To
HB248 (Carry Over) 2021-09-08 - Executive Session: 09/28/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=254&sy=2022&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2022&txtbillnumber=HB248 |