NH HB246 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-24 - Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. Burt): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 195-158 02/24/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a protective order for vulnerable adults.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a protective order for vulnerable adults.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-26 - House - Indefinitely Postpone (Y: 195 N: 158 NV: 15 Abs: 30) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24HouseIndefinitely Postpone (Rep. Burt): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 195-158 02/24/2021
2021-02-17HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
2021-02-17HouseMajority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 14-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 21
2021-02-16HouseExecutive Session: 02/16/2021 01:30 pm
2021-01-27House==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 02/08/2021 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92769044991 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-20House==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 01/26/2021 01:45 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94852322897 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time thecommittee is initially convened.
2021-01-09HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 2 P. 40

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback