NH HB245 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.770
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.770
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the cost of railroad crossings upon the restoration of rail service.
Title
Relative to the cost of railroad crossings upon the restoration of rail service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 26, PG.770 |
2013-02-27 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 13 (Vote 9-2; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.512 |
2013-02-19 | House | Executive Session: 2/26/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/19/2013 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-01-29 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 2/5/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 1/29/2013 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 12, PG.188 |