NH HB245 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-23 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.459
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-23 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.459
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study election of the attorney general by the legislature.
Title
Establishing a committee to study election of the attorney general by the legislature.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.459 | |
2011-02-17 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 23 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 15, PG.268 | |
2011-02-14 | House Executive Session: 2/16/2011 Legislative Office Building 306 1:30 PM or 45 minutes after House session | |
2011-01-25 | House Public Hearing: 2/3/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-01-20 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 11, PG. 179 |