NH HB243 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 33
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 33
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changing the definitions of "focus school" and "priority school" in the school performance and accountability law.
Title
Changing the definitions of "focus school" and "priority school" in the school performance and accountability law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 33 |
2015-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 5 |
2015-09-09 | House | Executive Session: 10/27/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-08-13 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/9/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-05-26 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/9/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-05-12 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/26/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-02-17 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 2/17/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-02-04 | House | Public Hearing: 2/12/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-02-04 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 2/12/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-01-29 | House | Public Hearing: 2/12/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-01-29 | House | ===CANCELLED=== Public Hearing: 2/3/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 2/3/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Education; House Journal 12, PG. 214 |