NH HB240 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/04/2021; Chapter 62; Eff: 08/03/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to identification of cannabis strain for therapeutic cannabis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to identification of cannabis strain for therapeutic cannabis.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-09HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/04/2021; Chapter 62; Eff: 08/03/2021
2021-05-26HouseEnrolled (in recess of) 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 104
2021-05-26SenateEnrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/20/2021); Senate Journal 17
2021-04-22SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/22/2021; Senate Journal 12
2021-04-14SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/22/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 20
2021-03-10SenateRemote Hearing: 03/17/2021, 09:15 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 15
2021-03-04SenateIntroduced 03/04/2021 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 7
2021-02-24HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0237h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 10
2021-02-24HouseAmendment # 2021-0237h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 10
2021-02-17HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0237h (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 7
2021-01-27HousePublic Hearing: 02/02/2021 11:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91285911171 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-09HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 2 P. 40

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback