NH HB239 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-11 - Vetoed by Governor Sununu 08/10/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-11 - Vetoed by Governor Sununu 08/10/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to prosecutions for certain assaults against minors.
Title
Relative to prosecutions for certain assaults against minors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Floor Amendment 1224s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 0 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Floor Amendment 1224s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 0 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-11 | House | Vetoed by Governor Sununu 08/10/2021 |
2021-07-28 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021 |
2021-07-28 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-24 | House | Conference Committee Report 2021-2032c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/24/2021 |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2021-2032c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/24/2021; Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2021-2032c; 06/24/2021 |
2021-06-16 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 06/16/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2021-06-14 | House | Conferee Change: Rep. R. Newman Replaces Rep. Harriott-Gathright 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 22 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Carson, French, Whitley; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Sen. Carson Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19 |
2021-06-08 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2021-1224s and Requests CofC (Reps. Abbas, Rhodes, Wallace, Harriott-Gathright): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/04/2021 House Journal 9 P. 53 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved Ought to Pass; 04/29/2021; Senate Journal 13 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Sen. Carson Floor Amendment # 2021-1224s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 04/29/2021; Senate Journal 13 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-1224s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/29/2021; Senate Journal 13 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 0Y-24N, Motion Failed; 04/29/2021; Senate Journal 13 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 04/29/2021; Senate Calendar 21 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 04/13/2021, 01:30 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Introduced 04/01/2021 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 11 |
2021-04-07 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50 |
2021-04-07 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 7 |
2021-03-02 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 6 |
2021-03-01 | House | Public Hearing: 03/01/2021 11:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/93127871930 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 2 P. 40 |