NH HB238 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB238
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - No Pending Motion; 05/05/2022 Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-05 - No Pending Motion; 05/05/2022 Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting provocations based on a victims actual or perceived gender, gender identity, gender expression, or sexual orientation from being used as a defense in manslaughter cases.
Title
Prohibiting provocations based on a victims actual or perceived gender, gender identity, gender expression, or sexual orientation from being used as a defense in manslaughter cases.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-05 - Senate - Refer to Interim Study (Y: 12 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-01-06 - House - OTP (Y: 223 N: 118 NV: 52 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - House - OTP (Y: 223 N: 118 NV: 52 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | Senate | No Pending Motion; 05/05/2022 Senate Journal 11 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Regular Calendar 12Y-12N, Motion Failed; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 05/05/2022; Senate Calendar 18 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Hearing: 04/14/2022, Room 100, State House, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 15 |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2022 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 2 |
2022-01-06 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 223-118 01/06/2022 House Journal 1 |
2021-11-16 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2021-11-16 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass 10/05/2021 (Vote 13-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 48 P. 24 |
2021-09-28 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 10/05/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2021-03-09 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | Public Hearing: 03/01/2021 02:30 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/93127871930 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 2 P. 40 |
Same As/Similar To
HB238 (Carry Over) 2021-09-28 - Full Committee Work Session: 10/05/2021 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203