NH HB235 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/17/2023; Chapter 31; Eff: 05/17/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-19 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/17/2023; Chapter 31; Eff: 05/17/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the landlord tenant mediation program.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the landlord tenant mediation program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-19 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/17/2023; Chapter 31; Eff: 05/17/2023 |
2023-05-15 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/04/2023 |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/11/2023); Senate Journal 15 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/13/2023; Senate Journal 13 |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/13/2023; Senate Calendar 17 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Hearing: 03/21/2023, Room 100, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced 02/22/2023 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 9 |
2023-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023--0148h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 P. 9 |
2023-02-22 | House | Amendment # 2023--0148h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 P. 10 |
2023-02-16 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0148h 02/08/2023 (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 6 |
2023-01-30 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/09/2023 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 7 |