NH HB235 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on September 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-07 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/24/2021; Chapter 222; Eff: 10/23/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on September 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-07 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/24/2021; Chapter 222; Eff: 10/23/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Addressing impacts to other water users from new sources of water for community water systems and relative to the PFAS fund and programs.
Title
Addressing impacts to other water users from new sources of water for community water systems and relative to the PFAS fund and programs.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Pearson [R] | Rep. Joseph Guthrie [R] | Rep. Dennis Green [R] | Rep. David Welch [R] |
Rep. Deborah Hobson [R] | Rep. Kenneth Weyler [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Salloway [D] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-07 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 08/24/2021; Chapter 222; Eff: 10/23/2021 |
2021-07-15 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021 |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-24 | House | Conference Committee Report 2021-1997c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/24/2021 |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2021-1997c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/24/2021; Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2021-1997c; 06/24/2021 |
2021-06-15 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 06/15/2021 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Avard, Gray, Watters; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Sen. Avard Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19 |
2021-06-07 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2021-1333s and Requests CofC (Reps. Renzullo, Suzanne Smith, Gunski, Healey): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/04/2021 House Journal 9 P. 51 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-1333s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2021-1333s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/13/2021; Senate Journal 15 |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1333s, 05/13/2021; Senate Calendar 23 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 05/03/2021, 01:15 pm, on proposed amendment # 2021-1218s; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 22 |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 05/03/2021, 01:00 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 22 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Introduced 04/01/2021 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 11 |
2021-04-07 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50 |
2021-04-07 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0580h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 45 |
2021-04-07 | House | Amendment # 2021-0580h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 45 |
2021-03-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0580h (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 22 |
2021-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/03/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following linkTo join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92220129569 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 2 P. 40 |